Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2465 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2465 Week
» 137281 Month
» 339945 Year
» 3366798 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
258 |
m/e |
09/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9258 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2470 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62470 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
09/1913 |
GLEN ROY |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
Glen |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Engine Brakes | Steam | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/05/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FW |
Fort William |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
EFD |
Eastfield |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1935 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
06/1935 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
06/1935 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 258, name: GLEN ROY Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9258 |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Gravity sanding fitted |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2470 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fort William (FW) |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62470 |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
05/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62470 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|