Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3179 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 3179 Week
» 137995 Month
» 340659 Year
» 3367512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
270 |
m/e |
03/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9270 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2483 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62483 |
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
Glen |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Engine Brakes | Steam | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/04/1959 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1919 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64G |
|
Hawick |
4w/e |
15/02/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/04/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1935 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
05/1935 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
05/1935 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 270, name: GLEN GARRY Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9270 |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Gravity sanding fitted |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2483 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
01/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62483 |
|
|
15/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
24/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62483 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|