Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1119 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1119 Week
» 135935 Month
» 338599 Year
» 3365452 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
20 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6820 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2232 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62232 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill |
Class |
D41 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E747 |
Works Number |
4886 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 88 | Train Brakes | Westinghouse | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 02/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 16/10/1951 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1896 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
23/12/1950 |
61C |
|
Keith |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/10/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
1910 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1912 |
Steam heating apparatus |
06/1947 |
LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 20 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4886 |
|
|
1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heating apparatus |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6820 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2232 |
|
|
06/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62232 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
16/10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62232 |
|
|