Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1265 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1265 Week
» 136081 Month
» 338745 Year
» 3365598 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
112 |
m/e |
02/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6912 |
y/e |
1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2256 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62256 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill |
Class |
D41 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E787 |
Works Number |
5223 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 88 | Train Brakes | Westinghouse | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 02/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/12/1952 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1898 |
KEI |
|
Keith |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/12/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/12/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1915 |
Steam heating apparatus |
1937 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1947 |
LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1947 |
Inverurie Works |
On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. |
SLS/194710 |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Keith |
In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. |
SLS/195109 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 112 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5223 |
|
|
02/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heating apparatus |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6912 |
|
|
1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2256 |
|
|
07/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62256 |
|
|
02/12/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62256 |
|
|