Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2608 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33258 Week
» 131903 Month
» 334567 Year
» 3361420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
309 |
|
26/03/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2717 |
|
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62717 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
26/03/1928 |
BANFFSHIRE |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1930 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 309, name: BANFFSHIRE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1396 |
|
|
05/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2717 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62717 |
|
|
01/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
13/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62717 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|