Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3629 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34279 Week
» 132924 Month
» 335588 Year
» 3362441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2760 |
|
20/06/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2735 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62735 |
y/e |
1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1957 |
Whitby MPD |
In store are 62731/5/55/9/62/4/70/2/5 an 69864/5/81. |
SLS/195711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2760, name: WESTMORLAND Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1444 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2735 |
|
|
1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62735 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
17/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
25/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62735 |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|