Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1730 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 18593 Week
» 9649 Month
» 356073 Year
» 3382926 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1913 |
m/e |
06/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7291 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
67291 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A218 |
To Service |
During 06/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 16/02/1953 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
w/e |
22/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
51J |
Northallerton |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1953 |
Darlington Works |
Nos. 78006/7/8/9 are in traffic. Can anyone confirm that they carry 1952 plates? No. 46478 has been in for intermediate and repaint. Nos. 67291, 67303/31 an 62373 have been condemned. The old shed at Ferryhill has been demolished: since the closure-16 years ago-a few engines on stock have been stored there, the last being Nos. 67278, 62359 an 62365, taken away about two years ago. 'J21' No. 65070 has received a full repair. |
SLS/195306 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1913 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7291 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67291 |
|
|
22/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
16/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67291 |
|
|