|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
18/04/1953 | Darlington Works | Nos. 78006/7/8/9 are in traffic. Can anyone confirm that they carry 1952 plates? No. 46478 has been in for intermediate and repaint. Nos. 67291, 67303/31 an 62373 have been condemned. The old shed at Ferryhill has been demolished: since the closure-16 years ago-a few engines on stock have been stored there, the last being Nos. 67278, 62359 an 62365, taken away about two years ago. 'J21' No. 65070 has received a full repair. | SLS/195306 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 439 Built at Darlington Works |
||
10/1928 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7331 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67331 | ||
02/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
17/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
23/02/1953 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67331 |