|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 413 Built at Darlington Works |
||
09/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7343 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67343 | ||
23/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
25/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
24/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
04/11/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67343 |