Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1975 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10919 Week
» 1975 Month
» 348399 Year
» 3375252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1184 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8184 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5534 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65534 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P52 |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/05/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
Information |
Back Cab Tender fitted specifically for working the Cambridge-Sudbury goods and Kings Lynn-Swaffham-Thetford goods duties where no turntables were available |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1184 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8184 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5534 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65534 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
05/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65534 |
|
|