Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3419 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29453 Week
» 128098 Month
» 330762 Year
» 3357615 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1860 |
m/e |
03/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5619 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65619 |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J24 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 69 (Domed firebox) | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 03/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/11/1951 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1896 |
HLD |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/11/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/11/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1860 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5619 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65619 |
|
|
21/11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65619 |
|
|