|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (ex Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/05/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1445 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1332 |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5932 | ||
09/1946 | Modification | Modification: Screw Reverse fitted | ||
09/1946 | Modification | Modification: Steam Reverse Removed | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65932 | ||
06/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
03/03/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65932 | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |