Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1703 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 18566 Week
» 9622 Month
» 356046 Year
» 3382899 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
548 |
m/e |
04/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8359 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68359 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J73 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
To Service |
During 04/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/12/1959 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51J |
Northallerton |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 548 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8359 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68359 |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
07/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68359 |
|
|