|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1950 | 15/03/1951 | 77 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1952 | 25/09/1952 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1952 | 27/11/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1953 | 18/08/1953 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1954 | 07/10/1954 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1956 | 14/07/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1957 | 21/03/1957 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1959 | 30/05/1959 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1961 | 10/06/1961 | 31 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
10/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting works or stored) | Awaiting works or stored: 60114/128/157/8, 62037/40/51/5, 63906, 90302/469, 92169/70/5. | SLS/196502 |
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
07/03/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) | Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. | SLS/196504 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62051 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26655 Allocated to March (MAR) |
||
29/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1950. Dep: 15/03/1951. | ||
22/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1952. Dep: 25/09/1952. | ||
21/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1952. Dep: 27/11/1952. | ||
28/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1953. Dep: 18/08/1953. | ||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 07/10/1954. | ||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. | ||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 14/07/1956. | ||
20/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1957. Dep: 21/03/1957. | ||
30/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1959. Dep: 30/05/1959. | ||
11/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1961. Dep: 10/06/1961. | ||
13/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62051 from Doncaster (36A) |