Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2086 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11030 Week
» 2086 Month
» 348510 Year
» 3375363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1761 |
m/e |
04/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4761 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9540 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69540 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22617 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 04/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Thu 21/07/1960 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1947 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1950 |
General |
Two N.E. Region engines recently named are 60127 Wilson Worsdell and 60153 Flamboyant of Heaton and York respectively. Owing to the scarcity of pull-and-push engines at King's Cross, the Alexandra Palace branch has been worked occasionally by 'N.2' tanks, Which run round the train. One of these, numbered 69540 on the bunker, had the former number 9540 visible on the tanks. A fitted 'N.7' from Neasden has also been assisting, as only one of the 'F.2' 2-4-2T (E.7111) now remains and is in poor shape. This engine, originally M.S. & L. No. 783, built by Beyer Peacock in 1896 (No. 3701), class '9G,' is the sole survivor of the G.C. 2-4-2T which once totalled 37 engines. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1761 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22617 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4761 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9540 |
|
|
08/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69540 |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
21/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69540 |
|
|