|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1909 | 10/04/1909 | General | New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1914 | 05/09/1914 | General | Boiler number 1369 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1917 | 18/08/1917 | General | Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1922 | 18/11/1922 | 176 days | General | Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1924 | 25/10/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5147 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1927 | 25/06/1927 | 176 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1929 | 28/09/1929 | 12 days | General | New L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1931 | 02/05/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1943 | 06/11/1943 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1944 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 5/45. |
|||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3753 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69935 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1957 | 14/09/1957 | 12 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/01/1959 | Frodingham MPD | Following the extensive use of diesel shunters here, the 5 Q1 0-8-0Ts allocated are now in store (69928/9/34/5/6). | SLS/195903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 147 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4228 Allocated to Keadby (KEA) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 10/04/1909. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 05/09/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1369 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 18/08/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
16/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5147 |
||
01/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. | ||
17/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder |
||
04/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
18/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
02/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
27/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943. | ||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 5/45. |
||
16/01/1945 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3755 boiler fitted | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3218 but not taken up | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9935 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
28/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3753 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69935 |
||
05/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A) |
||
14/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A) |
||
23/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. | ||
05/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A) |
||
03/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/09/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957. | ||
03/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69935 from Frodingham (36C) |