Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1992 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10936 Week
» 1992 Month
» 348416 Year
» 3375269 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
122 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3122 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2503 |
|
30/05/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_122) |
26/11/1926 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1808) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
12/1921 |
12/1921 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
24/11/1922 |
10/09/1923 |
291 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
07/11/1924 |
23/03/1925 |
137 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
11/08/1925 |
28/09/1925 |
49 days |
Light Repair |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
02/07/1926 |
26/11/1926 |
148 days |
General |
Boiler number D1808 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
22/04/1930 |
16/07/1930 |
86 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 122 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 904 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3122 |
|
|
24/11/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1922. Dep: 10/09/1923. |
|
|
30/05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2503 |
|
|
07/11/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1924. Dep: 23/03/1925. |
|
|
11/08/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1925. Dep: 28/09/1925. |
|
|
02/07/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1926. Dep: 26/11/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1808 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
07/04/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
22/04/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1930. Dep: 16/07/1930. |
|
|
29/12/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
08/08/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
22/10/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
30/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2503 from Selby (SEL) |
|
|