Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1089 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1089 Week
» 135905 Month
» 338569 Year
» 3365422 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
123 |
m/e |
05/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3123 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2504 |
|
15/03/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_123) |
05/11/1924 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1674) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
07/1921 |
07/1921 |
|
G 4 |
|
|
|
|
04/07/1923 |
04/07/1923 |
1 day |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
04/06/1924 |
05/11/1924 |
155 days |
General |
Boiler number D1674 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
16/02/1926 |
30/03/1926 |
43 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
05/11/1929 |
30/01/1930 |
87 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 123 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 905 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3123 |
|
|
15/03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2504 |
|
|
04/06/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1924. Dep: 05/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1674 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
16/02/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1926. Dep: 30/03/1926. |
|
|
05/11/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1929. Dep: 30/01/1930. |
|
|
18/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
01/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
06/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
15/07/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
22/10/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
30/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2504 from Selby (SEL) |
|
|