|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 26/07/1912 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7136 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1923 | 28/11/1923 | 132 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 406N |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1927 | 19/01/1928 | 128 days | General | Boiler number 8051 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3406 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1930 | 06/12/1930 | 29 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 406 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 966 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 26/07/1912. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7136 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
20/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1923. Dep: 28/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 406N |
||
14/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1927. Dep: 19/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8051 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3406 |
||
08/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930. | ||
03/02/1934 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3406 from Ardsley (ARD) |