28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Stock Returns |
No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
30/04/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902. |
SLS/194906 |
20/05/1962 |
South Wales |
5636/9/82 an 6687 withdrawn 19th May were noted as follows-on 20th May, 5682 was at rear of Abercynon shed marked 'not to be moved' and 5636/9 and 6687 were noted at Radyr waiting CME's decision. By 15th June, Canton's original Kings had dwindled to two-6010/28; (6003/4/24 are in store and 6023 stopped for factory while 6018/9 have been transferred to 81A). The 8-55 a.m. and 7-20 p.m. Cardiff-Salop are usually King-hauled. All Canton's Castles are regularly employed. |
SLS/196207 |
30/11/1962 |
Chepstow |
Normal two-way traffic was resumed in mid-November over the new bridge which has replaced the Brunel tubular span over the River Wye. 'Kings' 6011 King James I and 6018 King Henry VI were used on bridge weight trials on 5th and 6th November; 'Kings' are not normally allowed on the Gloucester-Newport line. |
SLS/196212 |
17/03/1963 |
Swindon Works (Works Yard) |
Triangle: 4612, 4915, 5027/95, 5931, 6112, 8472. Works Yard: 3769/84, 4082, 5072/78, 5659, 6011/18/25/26, 6369, 6815, 6933, 7314, 8773/76, 9725, D6352. Weigh House: 6944, 7822. 'C' Shop: W.D. 71528. Dump: 2883, 4939, 5023, 6101, 6342/48, 6422, 6962, 8770, 9652, 9727/44/47/59/75, 7334. Dismantling Shed: 5020. 'A' Shop: D35, D101, D809, D813/18, D825/29, D1001/7/11/35. D1018-27 new - in various stages of oonstruction, D3189, D3365/98, D3424, D3505/06/22/25, D4000, D6311, D7002/32/38, 3687, 3755, 3836, 4623/73/77, 5006, 5775, 6855, 6918/22/61/72, 7919/25/28, 8109, 8433/81, 9437, 9648/66/80, 15100/05. Stock Shed: D7072 New. On Running Shed: 6000. Ex Works: 3837, 6819/78, 7913, 8459, 9405. |
SLS/196304 |
24/04/1963 |
Derby MPD (Works Yard) |
42636 was badly damaged when it fell into the pit at Derby on 24th April. It is now on works undergoing assessment. |
SLS/196304 |
18/08/1963 |
Swindon Works ('A' Shop) |
Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. |
SLS/196309 |