|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 26/09/1911 | 08/02/1911 | -229 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 31/01/1923 | 28/04/1923 | 88 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 22/09/1925 | 20/10/1925 | 29 days | Unknown Regime | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7230 |
||
Stratford Works | 04/08/1927 | 20/09/1927 | 48 days | General | Additional bunker rails fitted Boiler number 209 (Diagram 43) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1930 | 17/10/1930 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 228 (Diagram 43) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/12/1932 | 05/01/1933 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 209 (Diagram 43) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/09/1934 | 21/09/1934 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 232 (Diagram 43) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/07/1935 | 30/07/1935 | 23 days | General | New chimney |
||
Stratford Works | 1938 | 30/04/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Stratford Works | 1939 | 29/04/1939 | Light Repair | For exhibition at Norwich |
|||
Stratford Works | 1940 | 09/04/1940 | General | ||||
Stratford Works | 1944 | 22/04/1944 | General | ||||
Stratford Works | 16/06/1945 | 29/06/1945 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 09/11/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 12/04/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 18/10/1947 | 23/10/1947 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 06/02/1948 | 06/02/1948 | 1 day | NR |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/09/1947 | Stratford Works | The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. | SLS/194711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 230 Built at Stratford Works, Works Number 1221 Diagram 43 boiler fitted |
||
08/02/1911 | Modification | Diagram 43 number 230 boiler fitted | ||
26/09/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1911. Dep: 08/02/1911. | ||
31/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1923. Dep: 28/04/1923. | ||
22/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 22/09/1925. Dep: 20/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7230 |
||
04/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1927. Dep: 20/09/1927. Work undertaken: Additional bunker rails fitted Boiler number 209 (Diagram 43) |
||
23/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1930. Dep: 17/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 228 (Diagram 43) |
||
06/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1932. Dep: 05/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 209 (Diagram 43) |
||
10/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1934. Dep: 21/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 232 (Diagram 43) |
||
08/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1935. Dep: 30/07/1935. Work undertaken: New chimney |
||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. Work undertaken: For exhibition at Norwich |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 09/04/1940. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. | ||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 29/06/1945. | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8081 | ||
12/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 23/10/1947. | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 68081 but not taken up | ||
06/02/1948 | Works Visit | |||
15/04/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 8081 |