Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 740 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2855 Week
» 25361 Month
» 328551 Year
» 1550116 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6155 16/08/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2116/08/1960
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27959
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 1
Multiple Fitting Red Circle
To Service 16/08/1960 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 06/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
GNP: All over Brunswick Green including front of cab 16/08/1960

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 16/08/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn on 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
11/03/1961   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.        


Works Visits
Works Date Stopped Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Notes Mileage
Inverurie Works 03/03/1961 03/03/1961 13/03/1961 11 days Light Casual     14,629
Inverurie Works 02/06/1961 02/06/1961 21/06/1961 20 days Light Casual     26,266
Inverurie Works 07/02/1962 07/02/1962 23/02/1962 17 days Not Classified     62,809
Inverurie Works 21/02/1963 21/02/1963 08/03/1963 16 days Not Classified    
Inverurie Works 13/05/1963 13/05/1963 14/05/1963 2 days Not Classified    
Inverurie Works 06/12/1963 06/12/1963 1 day Heavy Casual    
Inverurie Works 25/05/1964 25/05/1964 30/09/1964 129 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 23/09/1965 23/09/1965 27/11/1965 66 days Intermediate    
Inverurie Works 05/01/1967 05/01/1967 20/01/1967 16 days Intermediate    
Inverurie Works 29/06/1967 29/06/1967 05/07/1967 7 days Unclassified    

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/08/1960 To Service To service as D6155
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27959
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
03/03/1961 13/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1961. Dep: 13/03/1961.    
11/03/1961 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
02/06/1961 21/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1961. Dep: 21/06/1961.    
07/02/1962 23/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 07/02/1962. Dep: 23/02/1962.    
21/02/1963 08/03/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 21/02/1963. Dep: 08/03/1963.    
13/05/1963 14/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 13/05/1963. Dep: 14/05/1963.    
04/07/1963 Sightings Stabled on Keith shed, still in all over green Barking Bill  
06/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1963.    
25/05/1964 30/09/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1964. Dep: 30/09/1964.    
23/09/1965 27/11/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/09/1965. Dep: 27/11/1965.    
05/01/1967 20/01/1967 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1967. Dep: 20/01/1967.    
29/06/1967 05/07/1967 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1967. Dep: 05/07/1967.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6155    
14/04/1968 Sightings Thornton Junction: Dumped at Thornton Jct. RCTS 6/1968 Link
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up in the scrapyard - arrived today. RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev