Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1586 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27620 Week
» 126265 Month
» 328929 Year
» 3355782 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6402 |
m/e |
02/1932 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
277 |
To Service |
During 02/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1959 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1932 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
83D |
|
Laira |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6402 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
15/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6402 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|