Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2207 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28241 Week
» 126886 Month
» 329550 Year
» 3356403 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6420 |
on |
24/08/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
294 |
To Service |
Fri 24/08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 27/11/1959 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
24/08/1935 |
TN |
|
Taunton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
TN |
|
Taunton |
4w/e |
10/07/1948 |
LA |
|
Laira |
on |
14/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
TN |
Taunton |
4w/e |
10/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
LA |
Laira |
on |
14/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6420 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Taunton (TN) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (TN) |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
27/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6420 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|