Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 5 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1231 Week
» 20876 Month
» 55518 Year
» 1277083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6633 m/e 08/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84D Leamington 8w/e 26/03/1955
84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 16/07/1955
88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1955
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 03/11/1962
2A Tyseley w/e 07/12/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 07/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6633
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6633    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev