Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4257 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 25291 Week
» 123936 Month
» 326600 Year
» 3353453 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6707 |
03/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37007 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37506 |
03/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/6) |
37604 |
20/04/1995 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
03/02/1961 to March (31B) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
03/02/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
13/04/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
13/04/1976 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6707 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
16/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37007 |
|
|
13/04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37506 |
|
|
20/04/1995 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37604 |
|
|