Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2729 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33379 Week
» 132024 Month
» 334688 Year
» 3361541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6719 |
m/e |
08/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
2400 |
To Service |
During 08/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 18/07/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87C |
Danygraig |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
ALLOC |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6719 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2400 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
18/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6719 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|