Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3365 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34015 Week
» 132660 Month
» 335324 Year
» 3362177 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6913 |
07/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37213 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
07/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6913 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
26/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37213 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
23/04/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37213 |
|
|
04/05/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|