Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1056 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1056 Week
» 135872 Month
» 338536 Year
» 3365389 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6944 |
24/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37244 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
24/09/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
|
|
21/12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
12/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS (WR ATC isolated) |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS (WR ATC isolated) |
|
|
by 03/1979 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
Dual AWS (WR ATC isolated) |
jX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6944 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3501 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37244 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
11/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|