14/04/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 1 bay) |
Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. |
SLS/195905 |
13/05/1959 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
Paint shop-44467G, 44603 G, 48186 I, 48405 G, 73030 I, 73032 G, 12092, D3767/8 New; Diesel Erecting shop-10202, 12053, ED4/5, D3085, D3491, D5702; New Work-8 d/e shunters 0-6-0 (D3769-76). Test House-D5015/6/7, D3124; Diesel Finishing Shop-D5018, D1 Scafell Pike, D2 Helvellyn; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay-42375I, 42505 I, 42641 I, 44036 G, 44092 G, 44097 G, 44195 I, 44206 I, 44213 G, 44387 G, 44582 G, 47255 G, 47378 I, 47442 G, 48088 I, 48374 G, 48636 G, 48673 I, 73136 I, 75005 I; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay - stripping-52532, 43982, 44049, 44211. Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay-41000 (Boiler RBS 5240 no, 12594, type G9 ex 40928; present state-6 frame inserts, boiler in, motion and slide bars in partly, driving splashers and footplate supports fitted), 42508 I, 42531 I, 44188 I, 44414 I, 47414 I, 73132 I; Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay - stripping-73144; Erecting Shop, no. 3 bay-4 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 (D3-6), 6 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo (D5019-24); Yard-40047, 40680, 43205/54, 42541, 42661, 44588, 45032, 47309, 48111, 48385, 48643, 53806, 58281, 10100, 10800, Cecil Raikes. Stored locos. moved into Wks. yard-40931, 41068, 41119/63/4/7/93, 43231/301/441/522/745 an 43815. Stored locos, by side of Test House-40412/536, 41062, 41857 an 47214. |
SLS/195906 |
24/03/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (Waiting Works) |
Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. |
SLS/196304 |
15/05/1963 |
Derby Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. |
SLS/196304 |
16/06/1963 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196307 |
12/07/1963 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) |
Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. |
SLS/196308 |