Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4775 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35425 Week
» 134070 Month
» 336734 Year
» 3363587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7797 |
m/e |
01/1931 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1931 |
OXY |
|
Oxley |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
84G |
|
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
84B |
|
Oxley |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
84B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7797 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1153 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
19/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7797 |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|