Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 2655 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33305 Week
» 131950 Month
» 334614 Year
» 3361467 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8094 |
17/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20094 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
17/10/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
09/06/1993 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 05/2004 |
Cut At |
Cymru Metals (Llanelli) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
17/10/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/10/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8094 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20094 |
|
|
09/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20094 |
|
|
05/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cymru Metals: Llanelli |
|
|