Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 5209 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 16424 Week
» 7480 Month
» 353904 Year
» 3380757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8144 |
28/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20144 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
28/06/1966 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/06/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
09/03/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8144 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20144 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/01/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20144 |
|
|
23/08/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|