Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2713 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13928 Week
» 4984 Month
» 351408 Year
» 3378261 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8487 |
on |
02/07/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
1834 |
To Service |
Fri 02/07/1952 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/11/1963 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8487 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 1834 |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (85D) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (85D) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8487 |
|
|