Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 159 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 159 Week
» 134975 Month
» 337639 Year
» 3364492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
TOPS |
87029 |
04/06/1974 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
26/06/1978 |
Earl Marischal |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
87 |
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
04/06/1974 |
Withdrawn |
01/08/2004 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
01/05/2009 |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
04/06/1974 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/08/2004 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
04/06/1974 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/06/1974 |
To Service |
|
|
|
01/08/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 87029 |
|
|
01/05/2009 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|