Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 90 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 90 Week
» 134906 Month
» 337570 Year
» 3364423 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8716 |
m/e |
03/1931 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1931 |
PPRD |
|
Pontypool Road |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/04/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
17/05/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8716 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6696 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8716 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|