Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2743 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28777 Week
» 127422 Month
» 330086 Year
» 3356939 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9009 |
21/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55009 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
ALYCIDON |
21/07/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
21/07/1961 to Finsbury Park (34G) |
Withdrawn |
02/01/1982 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
15/03/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
14/06/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front, white window surrounds |
21/08/1979 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/06/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
17/10/1970 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/06/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
17/10/1970 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/11/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
|
|
27/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9009, name: ALYCIDON Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
15/03/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55009 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
21/08/1979 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front, white window surrounds |
|
|
02/01/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55009 |
|
|