Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 48 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 6094 Week
» 25739 Month
» 60381 Year
» 1281946 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92216   31/12/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 31/12/1959 to Cardiff Canton (86C)
Withdrawal During 10/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 5 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton (New) 31/12/1959
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 02/11/1963
81C Southall 6w/e 12/10/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 6w/e 19/09/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 26/12/1959
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1959
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 5w/e 19/09/1965
WDN   7w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1959 To Service To service as BR Number 92216
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)
   
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92216    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev