Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 2158 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11102 Week
» 2158 Month
» 348582 Year
» 3375435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7204 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
War Dept. |
77204 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90180 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1943 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/03/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
07/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/03/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7204 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25075 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77204 |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90180 |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
14/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90180 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|