Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4359 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35009 Week
» 133654 Month
» 336318 Year
» 3363171 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9784 |
on |
04/07/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
293 |
To Service |
Thu 04/07/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/05/1963 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
04/07/1936 |
PDN |
|
Old Oak Common |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/05/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9784 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
02/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9784 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|