Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78562 m/e 09/1944
LNER (1946) 3087 m/e 02/1947
BR (1st BR) 63087 w/e 04/09/1948
BR 90087 w/e 23/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25323
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Thu 25/10/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40B Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
40E Langwith Junction 5w/e 23/04/1955
41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/07/1958
36C Frodingham w/e 06/02/1960
   Withdrawn 25/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   25/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78562
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25323
   
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90087    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
25/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90087    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev