Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4119 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34769 Week
» 133414 Month
» 336078 Year
» 3362931 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79294 |
m/e |
03/1945 |
British Railways |
90721 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5237 |
To Service |
During 03/1945 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 09/09/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
02/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
5w/e |
11/01/1964 |
ALLOC |
55D |
Royston |
4w/e |
16/07/1966 |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Stratton Park |
The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79294 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5237 |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90721 |
|
|
02/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90721 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|