Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1237 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31887 Week
» 130532 Month
» 333196 Year
» 3360049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
26004 |
17/02/1951 |
TOPS (Tops) |
76004 |
23/02/1974 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
17/02/1951 |
vo |
Vacuum braked, No heat |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/02/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 26004 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
30/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ilford (30a) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (36b) |
|
|
01/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reddish (39a) |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76004 |
|
|
14/08/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Reddish (RS) |
|
|
25/06/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76004 |
|
|
01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|