|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/05/1961 | Derby Works (In Works Sidings) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1919 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3888 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (15D) | ||
16/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43888 | ||
27/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Albans (14C) | ||
08/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) | ||
07/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) | ||
26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43888 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |