Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 434 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 434 Week
» 135250 Month
» 337914 Year
» 3364767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1016 |
m/e |
07/1915 |
British Railways |
31016 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1915 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/07/1951 |
Service Life |
36 yrs , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1949 |
\"H\" Class 0-4-4T\'s |
Five 'H' Class 0-4-4T's, Nos. 31016, 1164, 21182, 31520 an 1523, have been fitted for pull-and-push working, to replace the 'D.3' 0-4-4T's now being withdrawn. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1016 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31016 |
|
|
31/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31016 |
|
|