Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 4511 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35161 Week
» 133806 Month
» 336470 Year
» 3363323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1865 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
31865 |
y/e |
1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1925 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1963 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 3 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1925 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HIT |
Hither Green |
8w/e |
31/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1865 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31865 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31865 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|