|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/10/1958 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay) | 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8530 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1980 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) | ||
18/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48530 | ||
28/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
12/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
13/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) | ||
26/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) | ||
19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48530 | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |