Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 2644 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13859 Week
» 4915 Month
» 351339 Year
» 3378192 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3381 |
y/e |
1892 |
British Railways |
43381 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/06/1959 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3381 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) (21D) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43381 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43381 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|