Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 2149 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11093 Week
» 2149 Month
» 348573 Year
» 3375426 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
100 |
|
02/1902 |
Great Western Railway |
2900 |
|
28/12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
Saint |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
132 |
Works Number |
1928 |
To Service |
During 02/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/06/1932 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1903 |
D2 boiler fitted |
04/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1912 |
D4 boiler fitted |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Swindon Works |
13/05/1902 |
|
29/05/1902 |
15 days |
Adjustment |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 100 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1928 |
|
|
29/04/1902 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
29/05/1902 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (Adjustment) - Dep: 29/05/1902. Stopped on 13/05/1902 |
|
|
06/1902 |
Naming |
Named 'DEAN' |
|
|
14/06/1902 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon Stock shed (SW Stock) |
|
|
16/06/1902 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
02/08/1902 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (B&E) (B) |
|
|
11/1902 |
Naming |
Renamed 'WILLIAM DEAN' |
|
|
06/1903 |
Modification |
Modification: D2 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: D4 boiler fitted |
|
|
28/12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2900 |
|
|
17/06/1932 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2900 |
|
|
11/03/1933 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|