Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3214 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 24248 Week
» 122893 Month
» 325557 Year
» 3352410 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3326 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3289 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (90xx) |
9089 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Duke |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
113 |
Works Number |
1696 |
To Service |
During 07/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1951 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 13 dys |
Information |
Denamed: Operating dept requested name removed to avoid confusing passengers believing the name to be the destination |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
w/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1906 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
08/1917 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
10/1929 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. |
SLS/194805 |
21/10/1948 |
Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) |
On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3326, name: St. Austell Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1696 Diagram S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1906 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3289 |
|
|
08/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
10/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9089 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
13/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9089 |
|
|